ID SCR140 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

STATE HOSPITAL SOUTH -- Stating findings of the Legislature and authorizing the Department of Health and Welfare to enter into an agreement with the Idaho State Building Authority to finance a new skilled nursing facility on the Idaho State Hospital South campus.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and authorizing the Department of Health and Welfare to enter into an agreement with the Idaho State Building Authority to finance a new skilled nursing facility on the Idaho State Hospital South campus.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
2018-03-15HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2018-03-14SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2018-03-14SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2018-03-13Houseto Senate
2018-03-13HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-13HouseRead Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 53-15-2
2018-03-12HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-03-09HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-08HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-07HouseRead First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare
2018-03-07HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-03-06Senateto House
2018-03-06SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-06SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED 35-0-0
2018-03-02SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day
2018-02-28SenateReferred to State Affairs
2018-02-28SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback