ID SCR138 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

MOUNTAIN STANDARD TIME ZONE -- Urging that the people of the State of Idaho and its state and county officials carefully monitor the State of Washington's actions regarding its time zone and be prepared to consider requesting that the United States Department of Transportation include Idaho's northern ten counties consisting of Benewah, Bonner, Boundary, Clearwater, Idaho, Kootenai, Latah, Lewis, Nez Perce and Shoshone within the Mountain Standard Time Zone and exempt those counties from Daylight Savings Time.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging that the people of the State of Idaho and its state and county officials carefully monitor the State of Washington's actions regarding its time zone and be prepared to consider requesting that the United States Department of Transportation include Idaho's northern ten counties consisting of Benewah, Bonner, Boundary, Clearwater, Idaho, Kootenai, Latah, Lewis, Nez Perce and Shoshone within the Mountain Standard Time Zone and exempt those counties from Daylight Savings Time.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-13SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
2018-03-12HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2018-03-09SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2018-03-08SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2018-03-08Houseto Senate
2018-03-08HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-08HouseRead Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2018-03-07HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-06HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-01HouseRead First Time, Referred to State Affairs
2018-03-01HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-02-28Senateto House
2018-02-28SenateTitle apvd
2018-02-28SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED 35-0-0
2018-02-27SenateReported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day
2018-02-26SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback