ID SCR137 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-19 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

IDAHO STATE POLICE -- RULE REJECTION -- Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the Idaho State Police relating to Rules of the Idaho Peace Officer Standards and Training Council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the Idaho State Police relating to Rules of the Idaho Peace Officer Standards and Training Council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
2018-03-19HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2018-03-16SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2018-03-15SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2018-03-15Houseto Senate
2018-03-15HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-15HouseRules Suspended:
2018-03-15HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-14HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-27HouseRead First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2018-02-27HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-02-26Senateto House
2018-02-26SenateTitle apvd
2018-02-26SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2018-02-23SenateReported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day
2018-02-22SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback