ID SCR136 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

SOCIAL WORK MONTH -- Proclaiming March 2018 as National Social Work Month and calling upon citizens in celebration and support of the social work profession.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proclaiming March 2018 as National Social Work Month and calling upon citizens in celebration and support of the social work profession.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-13SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
2018-03-12HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2018-03-09SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2018-03-08SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2018-03-08Houseto Senate
2018-03-08HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-08HouseRead Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 41-27-2
2018-03-07HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-03-06HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-03-05HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-03-02HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-01HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-22HouseRead First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare
2018-02-22HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-02-21Senateto House
2018-02-21SenateTitle apvd
2018-02-21SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote -Webb
2018-02-16SenateReported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback