ID SCR134 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

TRANSPORTATION -- Stating findings of the Legislature and authorizing the Legislative Council to appoint a committee to undertake and complete a study of the imposition of registration and operating fees for commercial vehicles and farm vehicles weighing over 60,000 pounds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and authorizing the Legislative Council to appoint a committee to undertake and complete a study of the imposition of registration and operating fees for commercial vehicles and farm vehicles weighing over 60,000 pounds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
2018-03-20HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2018-03-19SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2018-03-19SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2018-03-16Houseto Senate
2018-03-16HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-16HouseRules Suspended:
2018-03-16HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-15HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-21HouseRead First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense
2018-02-21HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-02-20Senateto House
2018-02-20SenateTitle apvd
2018-02-20SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED 34-1-0
2018-02-13SenateReported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day
2018-02-12SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback