ID SCR129 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

FAMILIES -- Stating findings of the Legislature and encouraging the adoption of policies that build the capacity of the family to be self-sufficient rather than increase government programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and encouraging the adoption of policies that build the capacity of the family to be self-sufficient rather than increase government programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
2018-03-08HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2018-03-07SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2018-03-07SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2018-03-06Houseto Senate
2018-03-06HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-06HouseRead Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 57-10-3
2018-03-05HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-03-02HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-01HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-12HouseRead First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare
2018-02-12HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-02-09Senateto House
2018-02-09SenateTitle apvd
2018-02-09SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2018-02-08SenateRetained on calendar
2018-02-07SenateReported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day
2018-02-06SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback