ID SCR128 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

CENTENNIAL OF THE PASSAGE OF THE 19TH AMENDMENT -- Stating findings of the Legislature and encouraging Idahoans to use March 1, 2018, through March 2, 2020, as a period of preparation for the centennial of the passage of the 19th Amendment and to plan commemoration activities that will honor and recognize women leaders of the past and present, foster women leaders of the future, advance women's leadership in business and politics, and encourage women to vote.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and encouraging Idahoans to use March 1, 2018, through March 2, 2020, as a period of preparation for the centennial of the passage of the 19th Amendment and to plan commemoration activities that will honor and recognize women leaders of the past and present, foster women leaders of the future, advance women's leadership in business and politics, and encourage women to vote.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-13SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
2018-03-12HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2018-03-09SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2018-03-08SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2018-03-08Houseto Senate
2018-03-08HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-08HouseRead Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2018-03-07HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-06HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-14HouseRead First Time, Referred to State Affairs
2018-02-14HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-02-13Senateto House
2018-02-13SenateTitle apvd
2018-02-13SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2018-02-09SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day
2018-02-05SenateReferred to State Affairs
2018-02-02SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback