ID SCR125 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-05 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-05 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
JOINT RULE 4 -- Amends Joint Rule 4 to confirm existing practice of enrolling and engrossing bills.
Title
Amends Joint Rule 4 to confirm existing practice of enrolling and engrossing bills.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State |
2018-02-05 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2018-01-30 | House | to Senate |
2018-01-30 | House | Title apvd |
2018-01-30 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 69-0-1 |
2018-01-29 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-01-26 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-01-19 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2018-01-19 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2018-01-18 | Senate | to House |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED 35-0-0 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |