ID SCR123 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - Rpt delivered to Secretary of State on 03/26
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - Rpt delivered to Secretary of State on 03/26
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stating findings of the Legislature and authorizing the Department of Parks and Recreation to enter into agreements with the Idaho State Building Authority to restructure financing of certain bonds issued to acquire properties along Billingsley Creek in Hagerman Valley and to facilitate the exchange of property.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and authorizing the Department of Parks and Recreation to enter into agreements with the Idaho State Building Authority to restructure financing of certain bonds issued to acquire properties along Billingsley Creek in Hagerman Valley and to facilitate the exchange of property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | Rpt delivered to Secretary of State on 03/26 | |
2012-03-26 | To Secretary of State | |
2012-03-26 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-23 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-23 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-22 | To enrol | |
2012-03-22 | to Senate | |
2012-03-22 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-22 | 3rd rdg -- ADOPTED -- 66-4-0 | |
2012-03-15 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-15 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-14 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-14 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-14 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-02 | to St Aff | |
2012-03-02 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-02 | House intro | |
2012-03-01 | to House | |
2012-03-01 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-01 | Winder | |
2012-03-01 | 33-0-1 AYES -- Andreason, Bair, Bilyeu, Bock, Brackett, Broadsword, Cameron, Corder, Darrington, Davis, Fulcher, Hammond, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Keough, LeFavour, Lodge, Malepeai, McKague, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nuxoll, Pearce, Schmidt, Siddoway, Smyser, Stennett, Tippets, Toryanski, Vick, Werk, Winder NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- Goedde [District 10 seat temporarily vacant] Floor Sponsor | |
2012-03-01 | ADOPTED | |
2012-03-01 | 10th Ord | |
2012-02-29 | to 10th Ord | |
2012-02-29 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-28 | to printing | |
2012-02-28 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-28 | Senate intro |