ID SCR120 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FEE RULES -- Stating findings of the Legislature and approving administrative rules that impose a fee or charge, with exceptions, and rejecting certain agency rule dockets that are not approved.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and approving administrative rules that impose a fee or charge, with exceptions, and rejecting certain agency rule dockets that are not approved.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2017-03-28 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2017-03-24 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-24 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-24 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 60-10-0 |
2017-03-23 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-03-22 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-21 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2017-03-16 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |