ID SCR118 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-12 - Read First Time, Referred to Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-12 - Read First Time, Referred to Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
JOINT FINANCE-APPROPRIATIONS COMMITTEE -- States findings of the Legislature and adopts rules of the Joint Finance-Appropriations Committee for the 2024 legislative session and throughout the 2024 interim period.
Title
States findings of the Legislature and adopts rules of the Joint Finance-Appropriations Committee for the 2024 legislative session and throughout the 2024 interim period.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Appropriations |
2024-03-12 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2024-03-11 | Senate | to House |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Title apvd |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |