ID SCR117 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

MEDICAID -- Stating findings of the Legislature and authorizing the Legislative Council to appoint a committee to undertake and complete a study and to make recommendations regarding the effects of Medicaid eligibility expansion on existing programs that serve medically indigent individuals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and authorizing the Legislative Council to appoint a committee to undertake and complete a study and to make recommendations regarding the effects of Medicaid eligibility expansion on existing programs that serve medically indigent individuals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
2019-04-04HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-04-03SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-04-03SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-04-02Houseto Senate
2019-04-02HouseTitle apvd
2019-04-02HouseRules Suspended:
2019-04-02HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-04-01HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-29HouseRead First Time, Referred to State Affairs
2019-03-29HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-03-28Senateto House
2019-03-28SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-28SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED 34-0-1
2019-03-27SenateReported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day
2019-03-27SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback