ID SCR115 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
DIANE KELLY -- Stating findings of the Senate and recognizing, honoring and commending Diane Kelly for her service to the Idaho State Senate and to the people of Idaho.
Title
Stating findings of the Senate and recognizing, honoring and commending Diane Kelly for her service to the Idaho State Senate and to the people of Idaho.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State |
2017-03-22 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2017-03-20 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-20 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-20 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2017-03-17 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 20, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-03-15 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-03-14 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-03-13 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-10 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-10 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED 35-0-0 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |