ID SCR114 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

FEE RULES -- Stating findings of the Legislature and approving administrative rules that impose a fee or charge, with exceptions, and rejecting certain agency rule dockets that are not approved.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and approving administrative rules that impose a fee or charge, with exceptions, and rejecting certain agency rule dockets that are not approved.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
2019-04-03HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-04-02SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-04-02SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-04-01Houseto Senate
2019-04-01HouseTitle apvd
2019-04-01HouseRead Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 67-1-2
2019-03-29HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, April 1, 2019
2019-03-28HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-27HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-25HouseReferred to State Affairs
2019-03-25HouseReported out of Committee, Returned to the Desk for re-referral
2019-03-22HouseRead First Time, Referred to Business
2019-03-22HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-03-21Senateto House
2019-03-21SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-21SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2019-03-20SenateReported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day
2019-03-20SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback