ID SCR110 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

IDAHO SOIL AND WATER CONSERVATION COMMISSION -- RULE REJECTION -- Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the Idaho Soil and Water Conservation Commission relating to the Resource Conservation and Rangeland Development Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the Idaho Soil and Water Conservation Commission relating to the Resource Conservation and Rangeland Development Program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
2019-04-02HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-04-01SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-03-29SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-03-28Houseto Senate
2019-03-28HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-28HouseRead Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2019-03-27HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-26HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-20HouseReferred to Agricultural Affairs
2019-03-20HouseReported out of Committee, Returned to the Desk for re-referral
2019-03-19HouseRead First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation
2019-03-19HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-03-18Senateto House
2019-03-18SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-18SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2019-03-14SenateReported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day
2019-03-14SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback