ID SCR108 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - Reported delivered to the Secretary of State on 03/27/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - Reported delivered to the Secretary of State on 03/27/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rulemaking docket of the Idaho Fish and Game Commission relating to Rules Governing the Taking of Big Game Animals in the State of Idaho.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rulemaking docket of the Idaho Fish and Game Commission relating to Rules Governing the Taking of Big Game Animals in the State of Idaho.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | Senate | Reported delivered to the Secretary of State on 03/27/13 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State |
2013-03-27 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2013-03-25 | House | to Senate |
2013-03-25 | House | Title apvd |
2013-03-25 | House | ADOPTED -- 66-0-4 |
2013-03-25 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2013-03-22 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 25, 2013 |
2013-03-21 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2013-03-20 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2013-03-19 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2013-03-18 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2013-03-15 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 18, 2013 |
2013-03-14 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2013-03-13 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2013-03-12 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2013-03-11 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2013-03-08 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 11, 2013 |
2013-03-07 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-06 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2013-02-13 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2013-02-13 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2013-02-12 | Senate | to House |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Title apvd |
2013-02-12 | Senate | ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Read in full |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |