ID SCR107 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Read First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense
Pending: House Transportation and Defense Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

TRANSPORTATION -- Adds to existing law to establish an interim committee to complete a study of driver authorization cards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to establish an interim committee to complete a study of driver authorization cards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08HouseRead First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense
2021-04-08HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2021-04-07Senateto House
2021-04-07SenateTitle apvd
2021-04-07SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED 28-7-0
2021-04-06SenateReported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day
2021-03-19SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback