ID SCR103 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATION -- RULE REJECTION -- Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the Department of Administration relating to Rules of the Division of Purchasing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the Department of Administration relating to Rules of the Division of Purchasing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
2019-03-22HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-03-21SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-03-21SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-03-20Houseto Senate
2019-03-20HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-20HouseRead Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 65-0-5
2019-03-19HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-18HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-15HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 18, 2019
2019-03-14HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-13HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-12HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-11HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-08HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 11, 2019
2019-03-07HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-06HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-01HouseReferred to State Affairs
2019-03-01HouseReported out of Committee, Returned to the Desk for re-referral
2019-02-28HouseRead First Time, Referred to Commerce & Human Resources
2019-02-28HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-02-27Senateto House
2019-02-27SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-27SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote
2019-02-26SenateReported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day
2019-02-25SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback