ID SCR102 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

EDUCATION -- Stating findings of the Legislature and providing approval for North Idaho College to enter into an agreement with the Idaho State Building Authority to assist with the development of a building expansion and an athletic facility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and providing approval for North Idaho College to enter into an agreement with the Idaho State Building Authority to assist with the development of a building expansion and an athletic facility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14HouseRead First Time, Referred to State Affairs
2019-02-14HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-02-13Senateto House
2019-02-13SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-13SenateRead in full -- ADOPTED 34-0-1
2019-02-12SenateReported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day
2019-02-11SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback