ID SCR101 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HEALTH -- States findings of the Legislature and requests that the Department of Health and Welfare develop draft legislation establishing a statewide planning, coordination, and funding system for emergency medical services.
Title
States findings of the Legislature and requests that the Department of Health and Welfare develop draft legislation establishing a statewide planning, coordination, and funding system for emergency medical services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-28 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State |
2023-03-28 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2023-03-23 | House | to Senate |
2023-03-23 | House | Title apvd |
2023-03-23 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 48-22-0 |
2023-03-22 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2023-03-21 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2023-03-20 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2023-02-22 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare |
2023-02-22 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2023-02-21 | Senate | to House |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Title apvd |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED 26-9-0 |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Recommitted to Health & Welfare |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |