ID SCR101 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-14 - Reported delivered to the Secretary of State on 02/13/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Stating findings of the Legislature and recognizing Power County on its 100th anniversary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and recognizing Power County on its 100th anniversary.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-14SenateReported delivered to the Secretary of State on 02/13/13
2013-02-13SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
2013-02-12HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2013-02-11SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2013-02-08SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2013-02-07Houseto Senate
2013-02-07HouseTitle apvd
2013-02-07HouseADOPTED -- voice vote
2013-02-07HouseRead Third Time in Full
2013-02-06HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2013-02-05HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2013-01-23HouseRead First Time, Referred to State Affairs
2013-01-23HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2013-01-22Senateto House
2013-01-22SenateTitle apvd
2013-01-22SenateADOPTED -- voice vote
2013-01-22SenateRead in full
2013-01-21SenateReported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day
2013-01-18SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback