ID S1337 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-28 - Signed by Governor on 02/28/14 Session Law Chapter 30 Effective: 02/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adds to existing law to provide for the crime of interference with agricultural production.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to provide for the crime of interference with agricultural production.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-28SenateSigned by Governor on 02/28/14 Session Law Chapter 30 Effective: 02/28/2014
2014-02-28SenateReported delivered to Governor on 02/27/14
2014-02-27SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2014-02-27HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2014-02-27SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2014-02-27SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2014-02-26Houseto Senate
2014-02-26HouseTitle apvd
2014-02-26HousePASSED -- 56-14-0
2014-02-26HouseRead Third Time in Full
2014-02-25HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2014-02-24HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2014-02-21HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2014-02-17HouseRead First Time, Referred to Agricultural Affairs
2014-02-17HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2014-02-14Senateto House
2014-02-14SenateTitle apvd
2014-02-14SenatePASSED -- 23-10-2
2014-02-14SenateRead third time in full
2014-02-12SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2014-02-11SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2014-02-10SenateReported Printed; referred to Agricultural Affairs
2014-02-10SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback