ID S1331 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - to St Aff
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adds to existing law relating to animals to provide for the Idaho Livestock Care Standards Board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law relating to animals to provide for the Idaho Livestock Care Standards Board.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-02 to St Aff
2010-03-02 1st rdg
2010-03-02 House intro
2010-03-01 to House
2010-03-01 Title apvd
2010-03-01 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 24-11-0
2010-02-24 to 3rd rdg
2010-02-24 2nd rdg
2010-02-23 to 2nd rdg
2010-02-23 rec d/p
2010-02-23 Rpt out
2010-02-10 to Agric Aff
2010-02-10 Rpt prt
2010-02-09 to printing
2010-02-09 1st rdg
2010-02-09 Senate intro

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback