ID S1260 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Signed by Governor on 03/22/16 Session Law Chapter 129 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

ANIMALS AND THE ENVIRONMENT - Repeals, amends and adds to existing law to revise the authorities and duties of the director of the Department of Agriculture regarding beef cattle feeding operations and dairy farms, to provide that certain specified law shall not affect the authority of the Department of Environmental Quality to administer and enforce an NPDES permit program; to revise design and construction provisions; to revise provisions regarding nutrient management plans and inspection provisions; to provide for compliance with dairy environmental management plans; to revise provisions regarding unauthorized discharges and releases; to provide the manner in which the Department of Agriculture shall address noncompliance and to provide for civil penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals, amends and adds to existing law to revise the authorities and duties of the director of the Department of Agriculture regarding beef cattle feeding operations and dairy farms, to provide that certain specified law shall not affect the authority of the Department of Environmental Quality to administer and enforce an NPDES permit program; to revise design and construction provisions; to revise provisions regarding nutrient management plans and inspection provisions; to provide for compliance with dairy environmental management plans; to revise provisions regarding unauthorized discharges and releases; to provide the manner in which the Department of Agriculture shall address noncompliance and to provide for civil penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-22SenateSigned by Governor on 03/22/16 Session Law Chapter 129 Effective: 07/01/2016
2016-03-18SenateReported delivered to Governor at 10:35 a.m. on 03/17/16
2016-03-17SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2016-03-16HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2016-03-15SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2016-03-15SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2016-03-14Houseto Senate
2016-03-14HouseTitle apvd
2016-03-14HousePASSED -- 63-2-5
2016-03-14HouseRead Third Time in Full
2016-03-11HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 14, 2016
2016-03-10HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2016-03-09HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2016-03-03HouseRead First Time, Referred to Agricultural Affairs
2016-03-03HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2016-03-02Senateto House
2016-03-02SenateTitle apvd
2016-03-02SenatePASSED -- 34-0-1
2016-03-02SenateRead third time in full as amended
2016-02-26SenateRead second time as amended, filed for Third reading
2016-02-25SenateRead first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
2016-02-25SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2016-02-25SenateAmendments reported printed
2016-02-25SenateAmendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
2016-02-25SenateReported out without recommendation, as amended
2016-02-25SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2016-02-18SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2016-02-05SenateReported Printed; referred to Agricultural Affairs
2016-02-04SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback