ID S1415 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-13 - Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-13 - Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ELECTIONS -- Adds to existing law to establish a presidential preference primary election.
Title
Adds to existing law to establish a presidential preference primary election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2024-03-13 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2024-03-12 | Senate | to House |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Title apvd |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Read in full as required) -- PASSED 31-4-0 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |