ID S1414 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 296 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 296 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $89,725,800 to the divisions of Child Welfare and Developmentally Disabled Services in the Department of Health and Welfare; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions for the two divisions to 809.78; provides legislative intent; and provides guidance for employee compensation and benefits.
Title
Appropriates $89,725,800 to the divisions of Child Welfare and Developmentally Disabled Services in the Department of Health and Welfare; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions for the two divisions to 809.78; provides legislative intent; and provides guidance for employee compensation and benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 296 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-29 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/30 | |
2012-03-29 | To Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-29 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-29 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-29 | To enrol | |
2012-03-28 | to Senate | |
2012-03-28 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-28 | Jaquet | |
2012-03-28 | 62-5-3 AYES -- Anderson, Andrus, Barbieri, Bateman, Batt, Bayer, Bedke, Bell, Bilbao, Black, Bolz, Boyle, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Chadderdon, Chew, Collins, Crane, Cronin, DeMordaunt, Ellsworth, Eskridge, Gibbs, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Hartgen, Henderson, Higgins, Jaquet, Killen, King, Lacey, Lake, Loertscher, Luker, Marriott, McGeachin, Moyle, Nesset, Nielsen, Nonini, Patrick, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Roberts, Rusche, Shepherd, Shirley, Simpson, Sims, Smith(30), Stevenson, Thayn, Thompson, Trail, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Barrett, Hart, Harwood, McMillan, Schaefer Absent and excused -- Block, Palmer, Smith(24) Floor Sponsor | |
2012-03-28 | PASSED | |
2012-03-28 | Rls susp | |
2012-03-28 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-28 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-28 | House intro | |
2012-03-28 | to House | |
2012-03-28 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-28 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2012-03-27 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-27 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-26 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-26 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-26 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-26 | to Fin | |
2012-03-26 | Rpt prt | |
2012-03-23 | to printing | |
2012-03-23 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-23 | Senate intro |