ID S1409 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 241 Effective: 04/08/10 Sections 1 & 2; 07/01/10 All other sections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Reducing the appropriation to the State Board of Education by $198,700 for fiscal year 2010; appropriating an additional $38,600 to the Office of the State Board of Education for fiscal year 2010; appropriates $3,450,600 to the State Board of Education for fiscal year 2011; and limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 21.25.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reducing the appropriation to the State Board of Education by $198,700 for fiscal year 2010; appropriating an additional $38,600 to the Office of the State Board of Education for fiscal year 2010; appropriates $3,450,600 to the State Board of Education for fiscal year 2011; and limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 21.25.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-08 Governor signed Session Law Chapter 241 Effective: 04/08/10 Sections 1 & 2; 07/01/10 All other sections
2010-03-29 To Governor
2010-03-26 Sp signed
2010-03-25 Pres signed
2010-03-25 Rpt enrol
2010-03-24 To enrol
2010-03-23 to Senate
2010-03-23 Title apvd
2010-03-23 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 58-10-2
2010-03-22 to 3rd rdg
2010-03-22 2nd rdg
2010-03-19 to 2nd rdg
2010-03-19 1st rdg
2010-03-19 House intro
2010-03-18 to House
2010-03-18 Title apvd
2010-03-18 Mortimer
2010-03-18 33-1-1 AYES -- Bair, Bilyeu, Bock, Brackett, Broadsword, Cameron, Coiner, Corder, Darrington, Davis, Fulcher, Geddes, Goedde, Hammond, Heinrich, Hill, Jorgenson, Kelly, Kerby(Keough), LeFavour, Lodge, Malepeai, McGee, McKague, McKenzie, Mortimer, Pearce, Siddoway, Smyser, Stegner, Stennett(Stennett), Werk, Winder NAYS -- Schroeder Absent and excused -- Andreason Floor Sponsor
2010-03-18 PASSED
2010-03-18 Rls susp
2010-03-18 to 3rd rdg
2010-03-18 2nd rdg
2010-03-17 to 2nd rdg
2010-03-17 rec d/p
2010-03-17 Rpt out
2010-03-16 to Fin
2010-03-16 Rpt prt
2010-03-15 to printing
2010-03-15 1st rdg
2010-03-15 Senate intro

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback