ID S1398 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 331 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 331 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to motor vehicles and crimes and punishment to revise certain penalty provisions.
Title
Amends existing law relating to motor vehicles and crimes and punishment to revise certain penalty provisions.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 331 Effective: 07/01/10 | |
2010-03-29 | To Governor | |
2010-03-29 | Sp signed | |
2010-03-29 | Pres signed | |
2010-03-29 | Rpt enrol | |
2010-03-29 | To enrol | |
2010-03-26 | to Senate | |
2010-03-26 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-26 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 53-13-4 | |
2010-03-23 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-03-23 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-23 | rec d/p | |
2010-03-23 | Rpt out | |
2010-03-16 | to Transp | |
2010-03-16 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-16 | House intro | |
2010-03-15 | to House | |
2010-03-15 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-15 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 32-3-0 | |
2010-03-12 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-03-12 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-11 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-11 | rec d/p | |
2010-03-11 | Rpt out | |
2010-03-05 | to Jud | |
2010-03-05 | Rpt prt | |
2010-03-04 | to printing | |
2010-03-04 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-04 | Senate intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/S1398.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/S1398.pdf |