ID S1393 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 76 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 76 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $17,002,400 to the Idaho Industrial Commission for fiscal year 2011; and limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 138.
Title
Appropriates $17,002,400 to the Idaho Industrial Commission for fiscal year 2011; and limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 138.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 76 Effective: 07/01/10 | |
2010-03-18 | To Governor | |
2010-03-17 | Sp signed | |
2010-03-16 | Pres signed | |
2010-03-16 | Rpt enrol | |
2010-03-15 | To enrol | |
2010-03-12 | to Senate | |
2010-03-12 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-12 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 65-1-4 | |
2010-03-11 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-03-11 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-10 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-10 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-10 | House intro | |
2010-03-09 | to House | |
2010-03-09 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-09 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 34-0-1 | |
2010-03-08 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-03-08 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-05 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-05 | rec d/p | |
2010-03-05 | Rpt out | |
2010-03-04 | to Fin | |
2010-03-04 | Rpt prt | |
2010-03-03 | to printing | |
2010-03-03 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-03 | Senate intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/S1393.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/S1393.pdf |