ID S1387 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Referred to 14th Order for amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

VITAL STATISTICS -- Adds to existing law to provide for changing the sex indicator on a birth certificate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to provide for changing the sex indicator on a birth certificate.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-19SenateReferred to 14th Order for amendment
2020-03-18SenateRetained on calendar
2020-03-17SenateRead second time as amended, filed for Third reading
2020-03-16SenateRead first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
2020-03-16SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2020-03-16SenateAmendments reported printed
2020-03-16SenateAmendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
2020-03-16SenateReported out without recommendation, as amended
2020-03-16SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2020-03-10SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2020-03-03SenateReported Printed; referred to State Affairs
2020-03-02SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback