ID S1386 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - U.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

DAYLIGHT SAVING TIME -- Adds to existing law to provide that certain areas of the State of Idaho shall make daylight saving time the permanent time upon a specified condition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to provide that certain areas of the State of Idaho shall make daylight saving time the permanent time upon a specified condition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-19HouseU.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee
2020-03-18HouseRead First Time, Filed for Second Reading
2020-03-18HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2020-03-18Senateto House
2020-03-18SenateTitle apvd
2020-03-18SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 32-0-3
2020-03-17SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2020-03-16SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2020-03-03SenateReported Printed; referred to State Affairs
2020-03-02SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback