ID S1384 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-26 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 137 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-26 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 137 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $5,723,200 to the Department of Labor for fiscal year 2013; appropriates $413,100 to reauthorize Reed Act moneys; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 31.1; and provides guidance for state employee compensation and benefits.
Title
Appropriates $5,723,200 to the Department of Labor for fiscal year 2013; appropriates $413,100 to reauthorize Reed Act moneys; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 31.1; and provides guidance for state employee compensation and benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-26 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 137 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-22 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/21 | |
2012-03-21 | To Governor | |
2012-03-21 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-20 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-20 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-20 | To enrol | |
2012-03-19 | to Senate | |
2012-03-19 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-19 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 61-4-5 | |
2012-03-16 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-16 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-15 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-15 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-15 | House intro | |
2012-03-14 | to House | |
2012-03-14 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-14 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 34-0-1 | |
2012-03-13 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-13 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-12 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-12 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-12 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-09 | to Fin | |
2012-03-09 | Rpt prt | |
2012-03-08 | to printing | |
2012-03-08 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-08 | Senate intro |