ID S1384 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 351 Effective: 04/12/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 351 Effective: 04/12/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to the state penitentiary to revise provisions relating to the justifiable killing or wounding of a prisoner in a state penitentiary or in certain private prison facilities; to revise provisions relating to the duties of the state Director of Correction in private prison facilities; to provide that certain contracts between the State Board of Correction and a private prison contractor shall contain certain terms; and to revise provisions relating to the powers and responsibilities of the Director of the Idaho Department of Correction when acting as the chief contract monitor of the private prison contract.
Title
Amends existing law relating to the state penitentiary to revise provisions relating to the justifiable killing or wounding of a prisoner in a state penitentiary or in certain private prison facilities; to revise provisions relating to the duties of the state Director of Correction in private prison facilities; to provide that certain contracts between the State Board of Correction and a private prison contractor shall contain certain terms; and to revise provisions relating to the powers and responsibilities of the Director of the Idaho Department of Correction when acting as the chief contract monitor of the private prison contract.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 351 Effective: 04/12/10 | |
2010-03-29 | To Governor | |
2010-03-29 | Sp signed | |
2010-03-29 | Pres signed | |
2010-03-29 | Rpt enrol | |
2010-03-29 | To enrol | |
2010-03-26 | to Senate | |
2010-03-26 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-26 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 62-0-8 | |
2010-03-23 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-03-23 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-22 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-22 | rec d/p | |
2010-03-22 | Rpt out | |
2010-03-12 | to Jud | |
2010-03-12 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-12 | House intro | |
2010-03-11 | to House | |
2010-03-11 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-11 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 34-0-1 | |
2010-03-10 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-03-10 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-09 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-09 | rec d/p | |
2010-03-09 | Rpt out | |
2010-02-24 | to Jud | |
2010-02-24 | Rpt prt | |
2010-02-23 | to printing | |
2010-02-23 | 1st rdg | |
2010-02-23 | Senate intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/S1384.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/S1384.pdf |