ID S1381 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 22 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-28 - Filed in Office of Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 22 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-28 - Filed in Office of Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CORONAVIRUS -- Adds to existing law to establish the Coronavirus Pause Act to prohibit certain actions related to coronavirus.
Title
Adds to existing law to establish the Coronavirus Pause Act to prohibit certain actions related to coronavirus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Senate | Filed in Office of Secretary of Senate |
2022-03-28 | Senate | None Veto SUSTAINED by Senate |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Blair(Johnson), Burgoyne, Burtenshaw, Guthrie, Heider, Lodge, Nelson, Nye, Patrick, Semmelroth, Stennett, Ward-Engelking, Wintrow, Woodward Absent and excused |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Agenbroad, Anthon, Bayer, Cook, Crabtree, Den Hartog, Grow, Harris, Lakey, Lee, Lent, Martin, Rice, Ricks, Riggs, Souza, Thayn, VanOrden(Bair), Vick, Winder, Zito NAYS |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate vote to override veto FAILED (less than two-thirds) 21-14-0 AYES |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2022-03-22 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2022-03-18 | House | to Senate |
2022-03-18 | House | Title apvd |
2022-03-18 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2022-03-18 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-17 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2022-03-16 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Business |
2022-03-16 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2022-03-15 | Senate | to House |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 24-11-0 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |