ID S1376 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by Governor on 03/26/14 Session Law Chapter 284 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by Governor on 03/26/14 Session Law Chapter 284 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to and repeals existing law to provide for the Dairy Environmental Control Act.
Title
Adds to and repeals existing law to provide for the Dairy Environmental Control Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 03/26/14 Session Law Chapter 284 Effective: 07/01/2014 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 03/20/14 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2014-03-19 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2014-03-17 | House | to Senate |
2014-03-17 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-17 | House | PASSED -- 54-13-3 |
2014-03-17 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2014-03-14 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-13 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-10 | House | Referred to Agricultural Affairs |
2014-03-10 | House | Reported out of Committee, Returned to the Desk for re-referral |
2014-03-07 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Environment, Energy, & Technology |
2014-03-07 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2014-03-06 | Senate | to House |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-06 | Senate | PASSED -- 28-7-0 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Agricultural Affairs |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |