ID S1376 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-26 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 135 Effective: 03/26/12 Section 1; 07/01/12 All other sections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-26 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 135 Effective: 03/26/12 Section 1; 07/01/12 All other sections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates an additional $113,000 to the State Independent Living Council for fiscal year 2012; appropriates $978,600 to the State Independent Living Council for fiscal year 2013; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 5; and provides guidance for employee compensation and benefits.
Title
Appropriates an additional $113,000 to the State Independent Living Council for fiscal year 2012; appropriates $978,600 to the State Independent Living Council for fiscal year 2013; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 5; and provides guidance for employee compensation and benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-26 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 135 Effective: 03/26/12 Section 1; 07/01/12 All other sections | |
2012-03-22 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/21 | |
2012-03-21 | To Governor | |
2012-03-21 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-20 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-20 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-20 | To enrol | |
2012-03-19 | to Senate | |
2012-03-19 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-19 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 60-5-5 | |
2012-03-15 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-15 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-14 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-14 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-14 | House intro | |
2012-03-13 | to House | |
2012-03-13 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-13 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 33-0-2 | |
2012-03-08 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-08 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-07 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-07 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-07 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-06 | to Fin | |
2012-03-06 | Rpt prt | |
2012-03-05 | to printing | |
2012-03-05 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-05 | Senate intro |