ID S1372 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
LANDS -- Amends existing law to provide for legal representation.
Title
Amends existing law to provide for legal representation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2022-03-17 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2022-03-16 | Senate | to House |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 29-6-0 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |