ID S1369 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Session Law Chapter 353 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- HEALTH AND WELFARE -- INDEPENDENT COUNCILS/INDIRECT SUPPORT SERVICES/HEALTHCARE POLICY INITIATIVES/LICENSING AND CERTIFICATION -- Appropriates $83,069,100 to the Department of Health and Welfare for the divisions of Independent Councils, Indirect Support Services, Healthcare Policy Initiatives, and Licensing and Certification for fiscal year 2019; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 389.10; and provides legislative intent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $83,069,100 to the Department of Health and Welfare for the divisions of Independent Councils, Indirect Support Services, Healthcare Policy Initiatives, and Licensing and Certification for fiscal year 2019; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 389.10; and provides legislative intent.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateSession Law Chapter 353 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-22SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2018-03-22HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2018-03-22SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2018-03-22SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2018-03-21Houseto Senate
2018-03-21HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-21HouseRules Suspended:
2018-03-21HouseRead First Time, Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-21HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-03-20Senateto House
2018-03-20SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-20SenateRead in full as required) -- PASSED 28-7-0
2018-03-20SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2018-03-20SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-03-19SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-03-19SenateReported Printed; referred to Finance
2018-03-19SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback