ID S1369 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Sections 2, 3 & 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Sections 2, 3 & 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS - MILITARY DIVISION - Appropriates an additional $3,500,000 from the Federal Grant Fund to the Military Division for the Federal/State Agreements Program for fiscal year 2016; appropriates $69,685,700 to the Military Division for fiscal year 2017; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 319.8; and grants a continuous appropriation for the Bureau of Homeland Security's Miscellaneous Revenue Fund for the purpose of covering incurred costs arising out of hazardous substance incidents.
Title
Appropriates an additional $3,500,000 from the Federal Grant Fund to the Military Division for the Federal/State Agreements Program for fiscal year 2016; appropriates $69,685,700 to the Military Division for fiscal year 2017; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 319.8; and grants a continuous appropriation for the Bureau of Homeland Security's Miscellaneous Revenue Fund for the purpose of covering incurred costs arising out of hazardous substance incidents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | Sections 2, 3 & 4 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Section 1; 07/01/2016 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 03/22/16 Session Law Chapter 96 Effective: 03/22/2016 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor at 11 a.m. on 03/16/16 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2016-03-15 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2016-03-10 | House | to Senate |
2016-03-10 | House | Title apvd |
2016-03-10 | House | PASSED -- 66-3-1 |
2016-03-10 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2016-03-09 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-03-08 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-07 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2016-03-07 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2016-03-04 | Senate | to House |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-03-04 | Senate | PASSED -- 35-0-0 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |