ID S1368 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-19 - Signed by Governor on 03/19/14 Session Law Chapter 152 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-19 - Signed by Governor on 03/19/14 Session Law Chapter 152 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $7,210,900 to the Department of Finance for fiscal year 2015; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 64; provides legislative intent relating to certain continuous appropriation; and provides guidance for employee compensation.
Title
Appropriates $7,210,900 to the Department of Finance for fiscal year 2015; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 64; provides legislative intent relating to certain continuous appropriation; and provides guidance for employee compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 03/19/14 Session Law Chapter 152 Effective: 07/01/2014 |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 03/14/14 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2014-03-14 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2014-03-12 | House | to Senate |
2014-03-12 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-12 | House | PASSED -- 59-3-8 |
2014-03-12 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2014-03-11 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2014-03-10 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2014-03-07 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 10, 2014 |
2014-03-06 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-05 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-05 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2014-03-04 | Senate | to House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-04 | Senate | PASSED -- 35-0-0 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |