ID S1367 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
CAMPAIGN FINANCE AND LOBBYISTS -- Amends, repeals, and adds to existing law to revise reporting requirements for lobbyists and to revise campaign finance requirements for candidates.
Title
Amends, repeals, and adds to existing law to revise reporting requirements for lobbyists and to revise campaign finance requirements for candidates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2022-03-21 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2022-03-18 | Senate | to House |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Read in full as required) -- PASSED 25-4-6 |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |