ID S1366 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 31 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-31 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 222 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 31 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-31 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 222 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to records exempt from disclosure to exempt certain financial statements submitted to the State Board of Education, its director or a representative thereof.
Title
Amends existing law relating to records exempt from disclosure to exempt certain financial statements submitted to the State Board of Education, its director or a representative thereof.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-31 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 222 Effective: 07/01/10 | |
2010-03-25 | To Governor | |
2010-03-24 | Sp signed | |
2010-03-23 | Pres signed | |
2010-03-23 | Rpt enrol | |
2010-03-22 | To enrol | |
2010-03-19 | to Senate | |
2010-03-19 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-19 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 55-1-14 | |
2010-03-17 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-03-17 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-16 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-16 | rec d/p | |
2010-03-16 | Rpt out | |
2010-03-08 | to St Aff | |
2010-03-08 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-08 | House intro | |
2010-03-05 | to House | |
2010-03-05 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-05 | 3rd rdg as amen -- PASSED -- 34-0-1 | |
2010-03-01 | to 3rd rdg as amen | |
2010-03-01 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-26 | to 2nd rdg as amen | |
2010-02-26 | 1st rdg | |
2010-02-26 | Rpt engros | |
2010-02-25 | to engros | |
2010-02-25 | Rpt out amen | |
2010-02-23 | to 14th Ord | |
2010-02-23 | Rpt out | |
2010-02-16 | to Educ | |
2010-02-16 | Rpt prt | |
2010-02-15 | to printing | |
2010-02-15 | 1st rdg | |
2010-02-15 | Senate intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/S1366.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/S1366.pdf |