ID S1357 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ELECTIONS -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the numbering of ballot measures.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the numbering of ballot measures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 2 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read third time in full -- FAILED 2-33-0 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |