ID S1354 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Session Law Chapter 304 Effective: 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Session Law Chapter 304 Effective: 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
HEALTH -- Amends existing law to establish provisions for electroconvulsive treatment for children.
Title
Amends existing law to establish provisions for electroconvulsive treatment for children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 304 Effective: 07/01/2024 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2024-04-03 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2024-04-03 | Senate | to enrol |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Title apvd |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Read in full as required) -- PASSED 24-11-0 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Read third time as amended in the House |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Read second time as amended in the House, filed for Third Reading |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the House, filed for Second Reading |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; referred to engrossment |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Referred to 10th Order for possible concurrence |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Returned from House, amended |
2024-04-02 | House | to Senate |
2024-04-02 | House | Title apvd |
2024-04-02 | House | Read third time in full as amended in House -- PASSED 46-23-1 |
2024-03-29 | House | Read second time as amended in House; Filed for Third Reading |
2024-03-28 | House | Read first time as amended in House; Filed for Second Reading |
2024-03-28 | House | Filed for First Reading |
2024-03-28 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2024-03-28 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2024-03-28 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-26 | House | U.C. to be placed on General Orders, no objection |
2024-03-25 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2024-03-22 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 25, 2024 |
2024-03-21 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2024-03-20 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2024-03-12 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare |
2024-03-12 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2024-03-11 | Senate | to House |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Title apvd |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended -- PASSED 23-12-0 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Referred to 14th Order for amendment |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Health & Welfare |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |