ID S1354 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-16 - Returned from House Failed; to Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- SUPERINTENDENT OF PUBLIC INSTRUCTION -- Appropriates $39,273,000 to the Superintendent of Public Instruction for fiscal year 2019; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 142.00; and provides direction on distributions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $39,273,000 to the Superintendent of Public Instruction for fiscal year 2019; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 142.00; and provides direction on distributions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-16SenateReturned from House Failed; to Secretary of Senate
2018-03-16HouseOrder ret’d to Senate
2018-03-16HouseRules Suspended:
2018-03-16HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-15HouseRead First Time, Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-15HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-03-15Senateto House
2018-03-15SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-15SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 34-1-0
2018-03-14SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-03-13SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-03-13SenateReported Printed; referred to Finance
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback