ID S1351 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Session Law Chapter 175 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

OCCUPATIONAL LICENSING -- Adds to existing law to provide for an occupational and professional licensure review committee, to provide for universal licensure, to provide that a person with a criminal conviction may inquire about the potential to become licensed in a profession or occupation, and to provide for evaluation of criminal convictions and language regarding persons with criminal convictions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to provide for an occupational and professional licensure review committee, to provide for universal licensure, to provide that a person with a criminal conviction may inquire about the potential to become licensed in a profession or occupation, and to provide for evaluation of criminal convictions and language regarding persons with criminal convictions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateSession Law Chapter 175 Effective: 07/01/2020
2020-03-12SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2020-03-12HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2020-03-11SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2020-03-11SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2020-03-10Houseto Senate
2020-03-10HouseTitle apvd
2020-03-10HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 49-19-2
2020-03-09HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2020-03-06HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2020-03-05HouseReferred to Business
2020-03-05HouseReported out of Committee, Returned to the Desk for re-referral
2020-03-03HouseRead First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare
2020-03-03HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2020-03-02Senateto House
2020-03-02SenateTitle apvd
2020-03-02SenateRead third time in full as amended -- PASSED 33-1-1
2020-03-02SenateRead in full as required)
2020-03-02SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2020-03-02SenateRead second time as amended, filed for Third reading
2020-02-28SenateRead first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
2020-02-28SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2020-02-28SenateAmendments reported printed
2020-02-27SenateAmendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
2020-02-27SenateReported out without recommendation, as amended
2020-02-27SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2020-02-26SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2020-02-21SenateReported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources
2020-02-20SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback