ID S1350 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Session Law Chapter 231 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- PUBLIC SCHOOLS -- CHILDREN'S PROGRAMS DIVISION -- Appropriates $310,044,600 to the Public Schools Educational Support Program/Division of Children's Programs for fiscal year 2019; and provides legislative intent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $310,044,600 to the Public Schools Educational Support Program/Division of Children's Programs for fiscal year 2019; and provides legislative intent.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22SenateSession Law Chapter 231 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-20SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2018-03-19HouseReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2018-03-19SenateReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2018-03-16SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2018-03-16Houseto Senate
2018-03-16HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-16HouseRules Suspended:
2018-03-16HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-15HouseRead First Time, Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-15HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-03-15Senateto House
2018-03-15SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-15SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 -Engelking
2018-03-14SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-03-13SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-03-13SenateReported Printed; referred to Finance
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback