ID S1346 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Session Law Chapter 248 Effective: 03/26/2018 SECTION 5 & 6; 07/01/2018 all other SECTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- PUBLIC DEFENSE COMMISSION -- Appropriates $5,804,800 to the Public Defense Commission for fiscal year 2019; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 6.00; provides legislative intent regarding the allocation of trustee and benefit payments in fiscal years 2018 and 2019; and provides legislative intent regarding encumbrances in fiscal years 2018 and 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $5,804,800 to the Public Defense Commission for fiscal year 2019; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 6.00; provides legislative intent regarding the allocation of trustee and benefit payments in fiscal years 2018 and 2019; and provides legislative intent regarding encumbrances in fiscal years 2018 and 2019.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26SenateSession Law Chapter 248 Effective: 03/26/2018 SECTION 5 & 6; 07/01/2018 all other SECTIONS
2018-03-20SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2018-03-20HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2018-03-19SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2018-03-19SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2018-03-16Houseto Senate
2018-03-16HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-16HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 65-3-2
2018-03-15HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-14HouseRead First Time, Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-14HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2018-03-14Senateto House
2018-03-14SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-14SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 33-0-2
2018-03-13SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-03-12SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-03-12SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-03-09SenateReported Printed; referred to Finance
2018-03-08SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback