ID S1346 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 343 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 343 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to beef cattle animal feeding operations to provide that the Idaho Department of Agriculture shall have authority to administer water quality laws in regard to certain beef cattle animal feeding operations, and to provide that the nutrient management plan and certain information generated as a result of the plan shall be confidential.
Title
Amends existing law relating to beef cattle animal feeding operations to provide that the Idaho Department of Agriculture shall have authority to administer water quality laws in regard to certain beef cattle animal feeding operations, and to provide that the nutrient management plan and certain information generated as a result of the plan shall be confidential.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 343 Effective: 07/01/10 | |
2010-03-29 | To Governor | |
2010-03-29 | Sp signed | |
2010-03-29 | Pres signed | |
2010-03-29 | Rpt enrol | |
2010-03-29 | To enrol | |
2010-03-29 | to Senate | |
2010-03-29 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-29 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 54-13-3 | |
2010-03-26 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-03-26 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-25 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-25 | rec d/p | |
2010-03-25 | Rpt out | |
2010-03-22 | to Agric Aff | |
2010-03-22 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-22 | House intro | |
2010-03-19 | to House | |
2010-03-19 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-19 | 3rd rdg as amen -- PASSED -- 26-6-3 | |
2010-03-18 | to 3rd rdg as amen | |
2010-03-18 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-17 | to 2nd rdg as amen | |
2010-03-17 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-17 | Rpt engros | |
2010-03-16 | to engros | |
2010-03-16 | Rpt out amen | |
2010-03-10 | to 14th Ord | |
2010-03-10 | Rpt out | |
2010-02-15 | to Agric Aff | |
2010-02-15 | Rpt prt | |
2010-02-12 | to printing | |
2010-02-12 | 1st rdg | |
2010-02-12 | Senate intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/S1346.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/S1346.pdf |