ID S1345 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Bill Previously Held at Desk, Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

INDUSTRIAL HEMP -- Adds to existing law to establish provisions regarding industrial hemp.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to establish provisions regarding industrial hemp.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05HouseBill Previously Held at Desk, Referred to State Affairs
2020-03-02HouseReported out of Committee Misdirected, Held at desk
2020-02-28HouseRead First Time, Referred to State Affairs
2020-02-28HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2020-02-27Senateto House
2020-02-27SenateTitle apvd
2020-02-27SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 27-5-3
2020-02-26SenateRetained on calendar
2020-02-21SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2020-02-20SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2020-02-19SenateReported Printed; referred to Agricultural Affairs
2020-02-18SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback